MS SC527 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Taylorsville High School "tartars" Football Team And Coach Chuck Robertson As They Celebrate The Mhsaa Class 2a State Championship.
Title
Commend Taylorsville High School "Tartars" Football Team for winning Class 2A State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Videt Carmichael [R] |
Sen. Chris Caughman [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-01-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-01-16 | House | Adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Rules |