MS SC525 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Former Mississippi Representative And Secretary Of State Dr. Eric Clark For His Stewardship Of The Community College System On The Occasion Of His Retirement As Executive Director Of The Mississippi Community College Board And For His Distinguished Service To The People Of The State Of Mississippi.
Title
Commend Dr. Eric Clark for stewardship of community college system and distinguished public service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-01-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-01-19 | House | Adopted |
2015-01-15 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |