MS SC523 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commemorating And Celebrating The 150th Anniversary Of The Founding Of Saint Joseph Catholic School In Jackson, Mississippi.
Title
Commemorate 150th Anniversary of Saint Joseph Catholic School.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-02-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred To Rules |