MS SC523 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Delta State University "statesmen" Baseball Team And Head Coach Mike Kinnison For Winning Their 13th Gulf South Conference Tournament Championship.
Title
Commend Delta State University "Statesmen" Baseball Team and Coach Mike Kinnison for 13th Gulf South Conference Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Russell Jolly [D] | Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. David Parker [R] |
Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Referred To Rules |