MS SC522 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Life Of Former Mississippi Senator Thomas Patrick (pat) Welch Of Mccomb, Mississippi.
Title
Commend life of former State Senator Pat Welch.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-01-14 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-01-12 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-01-12 | Immediate Release | |
2010-01-12 | Adopted | |
2010-01-06 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-06 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-01-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-01-05 | Immediate Release | |
2010-01-05 | Adopted | |
2010-01-05 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-05 | Referred To Rules |