MS SC521 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Passing And Saluting The Service Of Heroic World War Ii Fighter Pilot And Former Biloxi Mayor, Businessman And State Representative Jeremiah Joseph "jerry" O'keefe, Iii.
Title
Mourn the passing and salute the WWII Fighter Pilot service of former Biloxi Mayor and State Representative Jerry O'Keefe.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Referred To Rules |