MS SC520 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on February 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on February 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Celebrating And Congratulating The University Of Mississippi "ole Miss Rebels" Baseball Team And Head Coach Mike Bianco, Including The Athletes, Coaching Staff, Administration, Faculty, Students And Alumni, For Winning The 2022 National Collegiate Athletic Association Division 1 Baseball Championship.
Title
Congratulate Ole Miss 2022 Baseball Team for National Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-01-30 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-01-30 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-01-30 | House | Adopted |
2023-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred To Rules |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred To Rules |