MS SC520 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - Returned For Enrolling
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Noxubee County High School "tigers" Football Team And Coach Tyrone Shorter For Winning Their Fifth Mhsaa Class 4a State Championship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commend and congratulate Noxubee County High School "Tigers" Football Team for winning their fifth MHSAA Class 4A State Championship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-16HouseReturned For Enrolling
2018-01-16HouseImmediate Release
2018-01-16HouseAdopted
2018-01-16HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2018-01-11HouseReferred To Rules
2018-01-11SenateTransmitted To House
2018-01-11SenateImmediate Release
2018-01-11SenateAdopted
2018-01-10SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2018-01-05SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback