MS SC520 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Clinton High School "arrows" Boys Cross-country Team And Coach Of The Year Geary Howell For Winning The Class 6a Mississippi High School Activities Association State Championship, The First State Title In School History.
Title
Commend Clinton High School "Arrows" Boys Cross-Country Team for first-ever State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Perry Lee [R] | Sen. Chris McDaniel [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-01-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-01-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-01-19 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-01-19 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-19 | Adopted | |
2011-01-18 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-13 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-01-13 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-01-13 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-13 | Adopted | |
2011-01-12 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-10 | Referred To Rules |