MS SC519 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Celebrating And Congratulating The University Of Mississippi "ole Miss Rebels" Football Team And Head Coach Lane Kiffin, Including The Athletes, Coaching Staff, Administration, Faculty, Students And Alumni, For Dominating Penn State 38-25 In The 2023 Peach Bowl, For Achieving Its First 11-win Season In Ole Miss' 129 Seasons Of College Football, And For Its Top 10 Final National Ranking.
Title
Congratulate Ole Miss "Rebels" 2023 Football Team for historic season and dominating Peach Bowl victory.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-03-07 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2024-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred To Rules |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred To Rules |