MS SC519 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Congratulating The St. Andrew's Episcopal School "saints" Baseball Team And Coach Mark Fanning For Winning Its First 3a State Championship In 33 Years.
Title
Congratulate St. Andrew's Episcopal School "Saints" Baseball Team for 3A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-01-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-01-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-01-28 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Rules |