MS SC519 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Commemorate And Recognize The Last Speech Given In Mississippi By The Reverend Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., During The "poor People's March" On March 16, 1968, At Jennings Temple Christian Methodist Episcopal Church In Greenwood, Mississippi.
Title
Commemorate the last speech given in Mississippi by Reverend Dr. Martin Luther King during "Poor People's March" in Greenwood, MS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-01-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-01-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-01-22 | House | Adopted |
2013-01-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |