MS SC516 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-15)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-15)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Paying Tribute To The Memory And Career Of Pioneering Country Music Superstar Charley Pride From Sledge, Mississippi, And Extending Deepest Sympathy To His Bereaved Family.
Title
Pay tribute to the memory and career of pioneering country music superstar Charley Pride from Sledge, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-02-11 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-02-11 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-02-11 | House | Adopted |
2021-02-09 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred To Rules |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |