MS SC516 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Higher Education Advocacy Of Dr. L. Stacy Davidson, Jr., Of Oxford, Mississippi, And Extending The Condolences Of The Legislature On His Passing.
Title
Commend higher education advocacy of Dr. L. Stacy Davidson, Jr., of Oxford, Mississippi, and extend the sympathy of the Legislature.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Gray Tollison [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] |
Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Referred To Rules |