MS SC516 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The University Of Mississippi "ole Miss Rebels" Football Team And Coach Hugh Freeze For Their Impressive Victory In The Bbva Compass Bowl In Birmingham, Alabama, On January 5, 2013.
Title
Congratulate Ole Miss "Rebels" Football Team and Coach Hugh Freeze on impressive BBVA Compass Bowl victory.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-02-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-02-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-02-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred To Rules |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Referred To Rules |