MS SC515 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Condolences Of The Legislature To The Bereaved Family Of Former Director Of The Legislative Budget Office Robert (bobby) Abraham Greenlee Of Port Gibson, Mississippi, And Commending His Long And Dedicated Career Of Public Service.
Title
Extend condolences of the Legislature to the family of former LBO Director Robert (Bobby) Greenlee of Port Gibson, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-01-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-01-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-01-28 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Rules |