MS SC514 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Sympathy Of The Legislature To The Bereaved Family Of The State's Longest-serving Mayor, Dock Gabbert, Who Served As Mayor Of Derma, Mississippi, For More Than A Half-century, And Commending His Legacy Of Public Service.
Title
Extend sympathy of the Legislature to the family of the state's longest-serving Mayor, Dock Gabbert, of Derma, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-02-11 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-02-11 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-02-11 | House | Adopted |
2021-02-09 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred To Rules |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |