MS SC513 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Life And Public Service Of Former Senator Alan Michael Heflin Of Forest, Mississippi, And Express The Condolences Of The Mississippi Legislature To His Family.
Title
Mourn the loss and commend the life and public service of former Senator Alan Michael Heflin.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-01-26 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-01-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-01-26 | House | Adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |