MS SC512 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Celebrating The Contributions And Career Of Mississippi Music Icon And Rock And Roll Legend Jerry Lee Lewis Of Nesbit, Desoto County, Mississippi, And Expressing The Sympathy Of The Legislature On His Passing.
Title
Mourn the loss and celebrate the contributions and career of Mississippi music icon and Rock and Roll legend Jerry Lee Lewis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-01-30 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-01-30 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-01-30 | House | Adopted |
2023-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred To Rules |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Rules |