MS SC512 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Paying Tribute To The Legacy Of Former Pow And Retired Air Force Colonel Carlyle "smitty" Harris And Extending The Congratulations Of The Legislature To Smitty And His Family On The Occasion Of The Dedication Of The United States Post Office In Tupelo, Mississippi, To Be Named In His Honor.
Title
Remember legacy of former POW and Retired Air Force Colonel Carlyle "Smitty" Harris at U.S. Post Office dedication in his honor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-16 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred To Rules |