MS SC512 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on February 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on February 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The University Of Southern Mississippi "golden Eagles" Baseball Team And Coach Scott Berry For Winning The 2018 C-usa Tournament Championship And For An Outstanding Season, Including Its Third Consecutive Year In Ncaa Postseason Competition.
Title
Commend USM "Golden Eagles" Baseball Team for winning the 2018 C-USA Tournament and for third consecutive postseason.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-01-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-01-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-01-28 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Rules |