MS SC512 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Congratulating Taylor Machine Works In Louisville, Mississippi, On The Occasion Of Its 90th Anniversary Celebration And For Representing Our State At President Donald Trump's "made In America Week" And Governor Phil Bryant's "made In Mississippi Week."
Title
Congratulate Taylor Machine Works on its 90th Anniversary and for representing Mississippi at "Made in America Week."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-01-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-01-16 | House | Adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Referred To Rules |