MS SC512 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Life And Public Service Of Former Senator And President Pro Tempore Bobby Gerald "bob" Perry Of Southaven, Mississippi, And Expressing The Condolences Of The Mississippi Legislature To His Family.
Title
Mourn the loss and commend the life and public service of former Senator and President Pro Tempore Bob Perry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Referred To Rules |