MS SC512 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on February 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on February 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Legacy And Mourning The Passing Of Gop Pioneer Leon C. Bramlett Of Clarksdale, Mississippi, And Extending The Sympathy Of The Legislature.
Title
Mourn the passing of GOP pioneer Leon C. Bramlett of Clarksdale, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-01-26 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-01-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-01-26 | House | Adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |