MS SC512 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Remembering The Historical And Charitable Legacy Of Mississippi's First Miss America Mary Ann Mobley.
Title
Remember life and legacy of Mississippi's First Miss America Mary Ann Mobley.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-14 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-01-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-01-14 | House | Adopted |
2015-01-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |