MS SC511 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on January 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Passed on January 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Paying Tribute To Former "voice Of The Mississippi State Bulldogs" Jack Cristil And Extending The Condolences Of The Mississippi Legislature To His Surviving Family.
Title
Pay tribute to former "Voice of the Mississippi State Bulldogs" Jack Cristil and extend the sympathy of the Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-14 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-01-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-01-14 | House | Adopted |
2015-01-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |