MS SC510 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Congratulating And Extending The Greetings Of The Legislature On The Occasion Of The Sesquicentennial (150th) Anniversary Celebration Of The Incorporation Of The Town Of Terry, Mississippi.
Title
Recognize 150th Anniversary Celebration of Incorporation of Town of Terry, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Referred To Rules |