MS SC510 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Career Of Computer Innovator Dr. James Loton Flanagan Of Greenwood, Mississippi, And Expressing The Sympathy Of The Legislature On His Passing.
Title
Commend career and express sympathy of the Legislature on the passing of computer genius Dr. James Loton Flanagan of Greenwood.
Sponsors
Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] |
Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-01-26 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-01-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-01-26 | House | Adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |