MS SC509 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Mississippi State Parole Board Chairman Steven Pickett As The Longest-serving Chairman On The Occasion Of His Retirement After 30 Years Of Effective Government Service.
Title
Commend State Parole Board Chairman Steven Pickett on the occasion of his retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-08 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-08 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-08 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |