MS SC507 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Passing Of Former Mississippi First Lady And Community Activist Elise Varner Winter And Extending The Deepest Sympathy And Condolences Of The Legislature.
Title
Extending the deepest sympathy on the passing of former Mississippi First Lady and community activist Elise Winter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-08 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-08 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-08 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |