MS SC507 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Both The Kossuth High School Boys And Girls Bowling Teams And Coach Michael Lee For Sweeping The State Class 1 State Championships For 2017.
Title
Congratulate Kossuth High School Boys and Girls Bowling Teams for sweeping the State Championships.
Sponsors
Sen. Rita Potts Parks [R] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-01-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-01-16 | House | Adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |