MS SC507 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Judicial Service Of Veteran Hinds Circuit Court Judge William F. "bill" Coleman Of Madison, Mississippi, And Expressing The Sympathy Of The Legislature.
Title
Commend the judicial service of veteran Hinds Circuit Court Judge William F. Coleman and expressing sympathy of the Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-14 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-01-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-01-14 | House | Adopted |
2015-01-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |