MS SC507 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Legacy Of Legendary Mississippi Football Star Marcus Dupree From Philadelphia, Mississippi, On The Occasion Of The November 9, 2010, "espn" Documentary On His Career.
Title
Recognize legendary Mississippi football star Marcus Dupree on the occasion of his ESPN documentary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-24 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-01-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-01-19 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-01-19 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-19 | Adopted | |
2011-01-18 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-13 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-01-13 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-01-13 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-13 | Adopted | |
2011-01-12 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-04 | Referred To Rules |