MS SC506 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Mississippi Humanities Council On The Occasion Of Its 50th Anniversary And Extending The Thanks Of The Legislature For Its Support Of Humanities Education In Mississippi Universities And Community Colleges.
Title
Commend Mississippi Humanities Council on the occasion of its 50th Anniversary.
Sponsors
Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Sen. Joseph Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-08 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-08 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-08 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |