MS SC506 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Expressing The Intent Of The Mississippi Legislature That Daylight Saving Time Shall Be The Year-round Standard Time Of The Entire State Of Mississippi And Its Political Subdivisions.
Title
Express intent of Legislature that daylight saving time shall be the year-round standard time in Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-26 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-03-26 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred To Rules |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |