MS SC505 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on February 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on February 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Southern District Transportation Commissioner, Former State Senator, Former Mississippi Representative And Vietnam Veteran Thomas Edward (tom) King, Jr., For His Distinguished Public Service On The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Commend public service of Southern District Transportation Commissioner and former legislator Tom King.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-01-30 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-01-30 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-01-30 | House | Adopted |
2023-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred To Rules |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |