MS SC505 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Remembering The Public Service, Legal And Military Legacy Of Hinds County Senior Court Judge Honorable Houston J. Patton And Expressing The Sympathy Of The Legislature On His Passing.
Title
Remembering the legacy of Hinds County Senior Court Judge Houston J. Patton.
Sponsors
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Barbara Blackmon [D] | Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] |
Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Angela Turner-Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed |
2020-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Rules |