MS SC505 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Paying Tribute To Special Olympian Kyle Dutiel Of Brandon, Mississippi, For Winning 3 Gold Medals As An Equestrian Competitor In The Special Olympics World Games In Los Angeles, California.
Title
Paying tribute to Special Olympian Kyle Dutiel of Brandon, Mississippi, for winning 3 Gold Medals at World Games.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-01-26 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-01-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-01-26 | House | Adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |