MS SC504 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Congratulating James F. "ted" Booth On Receiving The 2020 Legislative Staff Achievement Award For His Remarkable Commitment To Producing The "redistricting Law 2020," Also Known As The Red Book, The Fourth Edition Of The Nation's Best Legal Resource On Redistricting.
Title
Ted Booth; commend for receiving the 2020 Legislative Staff Achievement Award from NCSL.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-02-11 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-02-11 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-02-11 | House | Adopted |
2021-02-09 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred To Rules |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Referred To Rules |