MS SC504 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-19)
Status: Passed on January 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-17 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-19)
Status: Passed on January 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-17 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Remembering The Gallant Service And Mourning The Loss Of United States Army Private First Class Patricia L. Horne Of Greenwood, Mississippi, Who Died In The Line Of Duty On August 24, 2012, In Bagram, Afghanistan.
Title
Mourn the loss of Afghanistan casualty United States Army Private First Class Patricia L. Horne of Greenwood, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-01-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-01-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-01-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-01-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred To Rules |