MS SC503 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on February 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on February 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Deepest Sympathy Of The Legislature To The Bereaved Family Of Former State Senator Charles Stevens (steve) Seale Of Hattiesburg, Mississippi, And Paying Tribute To His Career Of Public And Charitable Service.
Title
Mourn the passing of former Senator Steve Seale of Hattiesburg, and commend his public and charitable service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-01-30 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-01-30 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-01-30 | House | Adopted |
2023-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred To Rules |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |