MS SC503 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Remembering And Paying Tribute To The Professional Football Legacy Of Oakland Raider Super Bowl Champion William F. (willie) Brown Of Yazoo City, Mississippi, And Extending The Condolences Of The Legislature To His Surviving Family.
Title
Remembering the professional football legacy of Oakland Raider Super Bowl Champion William (Willie) Brown of Yazoo City.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-02-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Rules |