MS SC503 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Mississippi Hall Of Fame Belhaven Baseball Coach Hill Denson As The Eighth Mississippi Baseball Coach Chosen For Induction Into The American Baseball Coaches Association Hall Of Fame.
Title
Commend Belhaven Baseball Coach Hill Denson upon induction into American Baseball Coaches Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Chris Caughman [R] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] |
Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-01-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-01-16 | House | Adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |