MS SC502 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Hernando High School "marching Tigers" Band And Director Len Killough For Winning Four Class 6a State Marching Band Championships On The Occasion Of Their Appearance In The Mississippi Governor's Inauguration Parade.
Title
Commend the Hernando High School "Marching Tigers" and staff for winning fourth Class 6A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed |
2020-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |