MS SC501 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on February 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on February 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Congratulating President Mark Keenum And The Faculty Of Mississippi State University For Receiving A Chapter Of Phi Beta Kappa, The Nation's Most Prestigious Honor Society.
Title
Congratulate President Mark Keenum and faculty of Mississippi State University for receiving chapter of Phi Beta Kappa.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-01-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-01-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-01-28 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |