MS SC501 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-20)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-20)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Life And Remembering The Dedicated Public Service Of Former State Senator And Former Representative Robert H. "rob" Smith And Extending The Condolences Of The Legislature To His Bereaved Family.
Title
Commend life and public service of former State Senator and Representative Rob Smith.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-01-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-01-16 | House | Adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-02 | Senate | Referred To Rules |