MS SC501 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Congratulating The Mississippi Department Of Archives And History And Legislative Staff For Their Successful Application To The United States Department Of Interior For Naming The Mississippi State Capitol Building As A National Historic Landmark Which Is A Rare Designation Marking The Building's Architectural Significance.
Title
Recognize successful application for designating the Mississippi State Capitol Building as a National Historic Landmark.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |