MS SB3142 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 943, Local And Private Laws Of 2011, As Last Amended By Chapter 937, Local And Private Laws Of 2019, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2023, To July 1, 2026, On The Provision Of Law Authorizing The Board Of Supervisors Of Lauderdale County, Mississippi, To Fund The Lauderdale County Detention Facility's Good News Jail And Prison Ministry Chaplain And Chaplaincy Program From Nontax Revenue Generated By The Inmate Telephone Service; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Lauderdale County; extend date of repeal on authority to fund LCDF Chaplaincy program with certain revenue.
Sponsors
Sen. Rod Hickman [D] | Sen. Jeff Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed |
2023-03-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |