MS SB3124 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Board Of Trustees Of The Clay County Economic Development District To Sell Certain Real Property; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clay County; economic development district may sell certain land.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateDied In Committee
2019-03-25SenateRecommitted to Committee
2019-03-20SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-03-18SenateReferred To Local and Private

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback