MS SB3116 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Greenwood, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Derived From Hotel And Motel Room Rentals In The City; To Provide That The Revenue From Such Tax Shall Be Utilized To Promote Tourism And Parks And Recreation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Greenwood; authorize the levy of a tax on hotels and motels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Died In Committee | |
2011-03-27 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation | |
2011-03-26 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-26 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-26 | Amended | |
2011-03-26 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-03-25 | DR - TSDPCS: FI To LP | |
2011-03-22 | DR - TSDP: LP To FI | |
2011-03-15 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |